Richard Chillon et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: RICHARD CHILLON and DIANA CHILLON
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv02111
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 67 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Shaun Gahan counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Adding Andrew S. Gahan as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Andrew Shaun Gahan added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Gahan, Andrew)
November 20, 2023 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig A Taggart counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Patricia H. Jun is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Taggart, Craig)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines #64 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 8, 2023 Filing 64 Joint STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES filed by Plaintiff Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Diana Chillon(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 30, 2023 Filing 63 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #56 filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
August 9, 2023 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Richard Chillon et al. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Richard Chillon. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Richard Chillon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Richard Chillon. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #57 . Given the prior attempts to amend, the Court DISMISSES the Chillons' Second Cause of Action with prejudice. See Order for specifics. (jp)
July 3, 2023 Filing 59 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND CLAIM IN FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #57 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
June 26, 2023 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND CLAIM IN FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #57 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
June 15, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND CLAIM IN FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
June 1, 2023 Filing 56 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Amended Complaint/Petition #47 , filed by Plaintiffs Richard Chillon, Diana Chillon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Warranty))(Law, Daniel)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines [Dkt No. #54 ]. The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 10/16/2023 at 3:00 PM. The Trial is continued to 11/7/2023 at 8:30 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 17, 2023 Filing 54 Joint STIPULATION for Jury Trial on November 7, 2023 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates, #2 Proposed Order for Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates)(Scott, Caitlin)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #48 ). An amended complaint may be filed and served no later than 6/1/2023. See Order for specifics. (jp)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second and Third Claims In The Third Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Third Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #48 set for April 24, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
April 10, 2023 Filing 51 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second and Third Claims In The Third Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Third Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #47 #48 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
April 3, 2023 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second and Third Claims In The Third Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Third Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #47 #48 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
March 28, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second and Third Claims In The Third Amended Complaint #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 27, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second and Third Claims In The Third Amended Complaint , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions Of The Third Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #47 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #3 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
March 13, 2023 Filing 47 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Amended Complaint/Petition #41 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Chillon, Diana Chillon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warranty)(Law, Daniel)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #42 ). An amended complaint may be filed and served no later than 3/13/2023. See Order for specifics. (jp)
February 13, 2023 Filing 45 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second and Third Claims in the Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint #42 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
February 9, 2023 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caitlin Jane Scott counsel for Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Adding Caitlin J. Scott as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff RICHARD CHILLON and DIANA CHILLON. (Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party Diana Chillon(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(Scott, Caitlin)
February 6, 2023 Filing 43 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second and Third Claims in the Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint #42 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
January 19, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second and Third Claims in the Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #3 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
January 5, 2023 Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Amended Complaint/Petition #33 , filed by Plaintiff Richard Chillon, Diana Chillon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Warranty))(Law, Daniel)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines [DKT No. #38 . The Jury Trial set for 7/11/2023 at 8:30 AM. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023 at 3:00 PM.See Order for specifics. (jp)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 34) and STAYING Plaintiffs' Sixth Claim for Fraudulent Inducement -- Concealment #34 (See order for specifics) (rfi)
December 2, 2022 Filing 38 First STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Attachments: #1 Whang Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Steven Whang added to party Diana Chillon(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Whang added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #34 set for Monday, December 5, 2022 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 21, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Sixth Claims in the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint #34 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
November 14, 2022 Filing 35 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Sixth Claims in the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint #34 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Sixth Claims in the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
October 21, 2022 Filing 33 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiffs Richard Chillon, Diana Chillon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Law, Daniel)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation for Leave to Amend for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint #30 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 12, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Withdrawal of Stipulation for Leave #29 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
October 12, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Leave to Amend to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to First Amended Complaint)(Law, Daniel)
October 12, 2022 Filing 29 [WITHDRAWN PER DKT NO. #31 ] - STIPULATION for Leave to Amend to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Law, Daniel). Modified on 10/14/2022 (jp).
September 28, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order Denying Motion to Remand Case to State Court #27 was not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with a flattened version. (jp)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Motion to Remand (Dkt. #20 ). See Order for specifics. (jp) (Main Document 27 replaced on 9/28/2022) (jp).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion to Remand Case to Superior Court #20 set for 07/11/2022 at 1:30 PM off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
June 27, 2022 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
June 27, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
June 20, 2022 Filing 23 Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Jun, Patricia)
June 14, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Richard Chillon and Diana Chillon. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Law, Daniel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Richard Chillon and Diana Chillon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Richard Chillon and Diana Chillon. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Diana Chillon(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/20/2023. (vv)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2023 at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2023 at 8:30 AM. (vv)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Amendment to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #14 (with schedule attachment) (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
May 16, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Diana Chillon and Richard Chillon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon and Richard Chillon. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Diana Chillon(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (vv)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer&'s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. (Kuemerle, Karin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon, (Kuemerle, Karin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiffs Diana Chillon, Richard Chillon. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Richard Chillon and Diana Chillon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Richard Chillon and Diana Chillon. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Diana Chillon(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Richard Chillon(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-02111-DSF(AGRx). (ap)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
March 31, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Richard Chillon and Diana Chillon in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/13/2021, attached to Decl. of P. Jun as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Jun, Patricia)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Jun, Patricia)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV30118 Receipt No: ACACDC-33041944 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of P. Jun, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of P. Jun, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of P. Jun, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of P. Jun, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of P. Jun) (Attorney Patricia H Jun added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Jun, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Chillon et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CHILLON
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA CHILLON
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Represented By: Andrew Shaun Gahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?