Elliot Nazos et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elliot Nazos, Christine Blight, Jack Perry, Patricia Loughney, Timothy Dotson, Emily Barbour, Jill Silvernale and Kyle Blumin
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02214
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TOCOMPLAINT #41 by Judge Percy Anderson. The parties have demonstrated good cause to extend the time to respond, and for the reasons stated in the stipulation, the time to respond to the initial complaint is extended to July 8, 2022. (lom)
May 4, 2022 Filing 41 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 8, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Minnick, Kevin)
May 4, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. answer now due 6/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Minnick, Kevin)
May 4, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin James Minnick counsel for Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Adding Kevin J. Minnick as counsel of record for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attorney Kevin James Minnick added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Minnick, Kevin)
April 22, 2022 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Ostrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Scott Edelsberg as local counsel #25 . (iv)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey Stahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos, designating Scott Edelsberg as local counsel #24 . (iv)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steven Calamusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos, designating Scott Edelsberg as local counsel #27 . (iv)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Dennis Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Scott Edelsberg as local counsel #23 . (iv)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos, designating Scott Edelsberg as local counsel #26 . (iv)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Denying #18 Non-Resident Attorney Jason Alperstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. (iv)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02214-PA(Ex). (aco)
April 13, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Ostrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33114599) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
April 12, 2022 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (lom)
April 12, 2022 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Calamusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33114670) filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 12, 2022 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33114650) filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 12, 2022 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Ostrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33114599) filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 12, 2022 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey S. Stahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33114557) filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 12, 2022 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dennis Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33114523) filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 8, 2022 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (lom)
April 8, 2022 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 8, 2022 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #16 , Summons Request #17 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
April 6, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason H. Alperstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Elliot Nazos (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33082710) filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 6, 2022 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 6, 2022 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Elliot Nazos. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 , Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dennis O Cohen on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A Bentley on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Geoff S Stahl on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven G Calamusa on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Ostrow on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason H. Alperstein on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Emily Barbour, Christine Blight, Kyle Blumin, Timothy Dotson, Patricia Loughney, Elliot Nazos, Jack Perry, Jill Silvernale. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Emily Barbour, Christine Blight, Kyle Blumin, Timothy Dotson, Patricia Loughney, Elliot Nazos, Jack Perry, Jill Silvernale. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Emily Barbour, Christine Blight, Kyle Blumin, Timothy Dotson, Patricia Loughney, Elliot Nazos, Jack Perry, Jill Silvernale. (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33062962 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Emily Barbour, Jack Perry, Jill Silvernale, Christine Blight, Kyle Blumin, Patricia Loughney, Elliot Nazos, Timothy Dotson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Emily Barbour(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Christine Blight(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Kyle Blumin(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Timothy Dotson(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Patricia Loughney(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Elliot Nazos(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Jack Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Jill Silvernale(pty:pla))(Edelsberg, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliot Nazos et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Nazos
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Blight
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Perry
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Loughney
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Dotson
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Barbour
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Silvernale
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Blumin
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Dennis Cohen
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Stahl
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Lesley E Weaver
Represented By: Rachel A. Bentley
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin James Minnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?