Angela Padilla v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angela Padilla
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv02460
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2022, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company, identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kim, Laura)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(Attorney Laura K Kim added to party State Farm General Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Kim, Laura)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to State Farm General Insurance Company answer now due 6/3/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(Attorney Steven J. Elie added to party State Farm General Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Elie, Steven)
April 19, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela Padilla, upon Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by Serving Lai Saevang - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tucker, Stacy)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (ghap)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela M. Padilla, (Tucker, Stacy)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Angela M. Padilla. (Tucker, Stacy)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angela M. Padilla. (Tucker, Stacy)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-33114162 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Angela M. Padilla. (Attorney Stacy Monahan Tucker added to party Angela M. Padilla(pty:pla))(Tucker, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela Padilla v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Padilla
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura K Kim
Represented By: Steven J. Elie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?