Anthony Henson et al v. Super Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Henson and Cherie ONeal
Defendant: Super Care, Inc. doing business as Supercare Health
Case Number: 2:2022cv02820
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
2 Judge: Dale S Fischer
3 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court sets a status conference on July 18, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel are ordered to advise any defense counsel who have no entered an appearance of the date and time of the conference.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raina C. Borrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie ONeal (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 6/3/2022, Receipt No. 33409192) filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie ONeal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwartz, Adam)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raina C. Borrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie ONeal (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33409192) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raina C. Borrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie ONeal (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33409192) filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie ONeal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwartz, Adam)
May 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2;22-cv-02483 DSF(AGRx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02820 DSF(AGRx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
April 28, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Super Care, Inc. (lh)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie O'Neal, (Schwartz, Adam)
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie O'Neal. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Henson, Cherie O'Neal. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33203317 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Henson, Cherie O'Neal. (Attorney Adam J. Schwartz added to party Anthony Henson(pty:pla), Attorney Adam J. Schwartz added to party Cherie O'Neal(pty:pla))(Schwartz, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Henson et al v. Super Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Henson
Represented By: Adam J. Schwartz
Represented By: Raina C. Borrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie ONeal
Represented By: Adam J. Schwartz
Represented By: Raina C. Borrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Care, Inc. doing business as Supercare Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?