Jasmine Arthur v. FCA US LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Jasmine Arthur
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv02978
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER #37 by Judge R. Gary Klausner, the Court enters an Order awarding Plaintiff $10,500.00 for reasonably incurred Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and retains jurisdiction until funding is satisfied as outlined in the Parties' Joint Stipulation. (jp)
May 3, 2023 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $10,500.00, Joint STIPULATION for Order Request for Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation for Order to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction #35 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court continues the filing deadline of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses from 4/19/2023 to 5/22/2023. See Order for further specifics. (jp)
April 12, 2023 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION filed by JASMINE ARTHUR Jasmine Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna)
April 6, 2023 Filing 34 JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer filed as part of the Request for Judgment #33 . All pending dates re vacated. The Clerk shall close this action. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
April 5, 2023 Filing 33 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by JASMINE ARTHUR Jasmine Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
March 10, 2023 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT Joint Mediation Status Report filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines #29 . (jp)
January 27, 2023 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Ariel Harman-Holmes re Stipulation for Trial #29 filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 27, 2023 Filing 29 Joint STIPULATION for Jury Trial on October 24, 2023 filed by plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES)(Law, Daniel)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 3, 2023. (jre)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2023, at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2023, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
August 29, 2022 Filing 26 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2022. Discovery cut-off 2/3/2023. Motions due by 2/17/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2023, at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2023, at 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (jre)
August 29, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Jasmine Arthur for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff's Counsel Ariel Harman-Holmes. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 22, 2022 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/22/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
July 18, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA NORTH AMERICAN HOLDINGS LLC,FCA HOLDCO B.V., STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nassirian, Nejla)
July 15, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nassirian, Nejla)
July 15, 2022 Filing 19 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nejla Nassirian on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Nejla Nassirian added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Nassirian, Nejla)
July 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffery J Fadeff on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeffery J Fadeff added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Fadeff, Jeffery)
July 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
June 29, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/24/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (sh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jasmine Arthur, identifying Jasmine Arthur. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Complaint #1 . Counsel shall file the required Notice of Interested Parties on or before 5/6/2022 or risk the striking of the Complaint. (jre)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (sh)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33238428 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jasmine Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2019 Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Jasmine Arthur(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasmine Arthur v. FCA US LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Arthur
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Jeffery J Fadeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?