Eduardo Lopez v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eduardo Lopez
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03001
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Eduardo Lopez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Eduardo Lopez(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 10, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Eduardo Lopez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Eduardo Lopez(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/12/2024. (iva)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2023. Motions due by 12/22/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/12/2024. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2024 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on December 23, 2022 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2022 Filing 32 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 12/23/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of Defendant's Answer to Complaint [Dkt. 27], filed on August 31, 2022, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC [Dkt. 22], issued on August 29, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 1, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 31, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 26 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 31, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
August 31, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before September 12, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a request for the entry of default with respect to the applicable Defendant(s). Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 55(a). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has received Plaintiff's "Order to Show Cause Declaration Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (DKT 16)" (the "Declaration") [Dkt. #20 ], filed in response to the Court's OSC issued on August 3, 2022 [Dkt. #16 ]. The Court accepts the Declaration and hereby orders the OSC DISCHARGED. The Court further GRANTS the request to extend Defendant FCA US, LLC'S deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to August 22, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Ariel Harman-Holmes re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #16 re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: On July 29, 2022, the Court issued an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure of counsel to file the Court-ordered case management statement [Dkt. 15]. On August 12, 2022, counsel filed a Declaration (the "Declaration") [Dkt. 17] in response to the Court's OSC. The Court accepts the Declaration and hereby orders the OSC DISCHARGED. The Court further DIRECTS counsel to file its case management statement no later than August 29, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 12, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopezto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #15 (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before August 17, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a request for the entry of default with respect to the applicable Defendant(s). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS counsel for Plaintiff - Tionna Dolin and Ariel Harman-Holmes - to show cause why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for their failure to comply with the Court's Reassignment Order #12 . Counsel is required to respond in writing on or before August 12, 2022, at 12:00 noon. (lom) Modified on 7/29/2022 (lom).
July 8, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez, upon Defendant FCA US, LLC served on 7/6/2022, answer due 7/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez, identifying Eduardo Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-111) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03001-SSS-Ex. (aco)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice to Filer of Deficiency #8 and Complaint #1 . Counsel shall file the required Notice of Interested Parties on or before 5/9/2022 or risk the striking of the Complaint. (jre)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (rolm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant FCA US, LLC. (rolm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (rolm)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33241658 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Eduardo Lopez(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eduardo Lopez v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Lopez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?