Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company v. Zalman N., Inc. et al
Defendant: Zalman N., Inc. and Zalman T. Nemtzov
Counter Claimant: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: James Burgess
Case Number: 2:2022cv03010
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Filing 47 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company and against Zalman T. Nemtzov, Zalman N., Inc. in the principal amount of $0, interest in the amount of $0, attorneys fees of $0, costs of $2654.92. RE: Judgment, #44 . (aco)
June 1, 2023 Filing 46 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $2654.92 in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants Zalman T. Nemtzov, Zalman N., Inc. #45 (de)
April 19, 2023 Filing 45 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants Zalman T. Nemtzov, Zalman N., Inc. filed by Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Laurence, Patrick)
April 7, 2023 Filing 44 JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: 1. Voyager is entitled to summary judgment on its claim for declaratory relief and that Voyager has no duty to defend or indemnify Zalman for claims arising out of or related to Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. 20STCV17331; and 2. Zalman's Counterclaim against Voyager is dismissed with prejudice; and 3. Voyager shall recover from Zalman its costs of suit. (See document for further details). RE: MINUTES IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER #43 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that Zalman is not an additional insured under the insurance policy Voyager issued to MRB. As a result, Voyager is entitled to summary judgment on its claim for declaratory relief. The Court additionally dismisses Zalman's Counterclaim with prejudice. The Court will issue a Judgment consistent with this Minute Order. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the MOTION for Summary Judgment #31 is scheduled for April 10, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for April 10, 2023, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 5, 2023 Filing 41 Objection written objections of Voyager to Evidence offered in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Laurence, Patrick)
April 3, 2023 Filing 40 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Defendants Zalman T. Nemtzov, Zalman N., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bojic, Paul)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Defendant's response to the Rule 37(c)(1) issues raised in Voyager's Reply, which shall not exceed 4 pages, and any necessary supporting evidence, shall be filed by no later than April 3, 2023. Failure to file an adequate response by that date will result in the exclusion of the MBR Subcontract pursuant to Rule 37(c)(1) and the sustaining of Voyager's evidentiary objection to the Court's consideration of the MBR Subcontract. (See document for further details). (aco)
March 27, 2023 Filing 38 STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Additional Facts NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Laurence, Patrick)
March 27, 2023 Filing 37 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Laurence ISO Reply, #2 Memorandum ISO of Evidentiary Objections to Oppos. to MSJ)(Attorney Patrick Michael Laurence added to party Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:cd))(Laurence, Patrick)
March 20, 2023 Filing 36 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Defendants Zalman T. Nemtzov, Zalman N., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement, #3 Declaration)(Bojic, Paul)
March 15, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Claimant Zalman T. Nemtzov, Zalman N., Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Bojic, Paul)
March 10, 2023 Filing 34 EXHIBIT Compendium of Exhibits to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Counter Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Laurence, Patrick)
March 8, 2023 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Counter Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Laurence, Patrick)
March 8, 2023 Filing 32 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint #31 filed by Counter Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Laurence, Patrick)
March 8, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Voyager's Complaint filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&As ISO MSJ, #2 Declaration of Shane Roberts ISO MSJ, #3 Exhibit to Declaration of Shane Roberts ISO MSJ, #4 Declaration of Patrick Laurence ISO MSJ, #5 Exhibit to Declaration of Patrick Laurence ISO MSJ, #6 Proposed Order) (Attorney Patrick Michael Laurence added to party Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:cd)) (Laurence, Patrick)
February 28, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick Michael Laurence counsel for Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. Adding Patrick M. Laurence as counsel of record for Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attorney Patrick Michael Laurence added to party Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Laurence, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for April 13, 2023 at 9:00 a.m..(Burgess, James)
November 18, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James Burgess has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
November 17, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that James Burgess may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company(Walrath, Isaac)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of April 3, 2023. 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of April 10, 2023. 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for May 19, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. 4. Setting Court Trial Date of June 13, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/17/2023. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program will assign one. (jp)
October 7, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule ofTrial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for 10/17/2022 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (See attachment Civil Minutes for further information). (jp)
October 3, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Walrath, Isaac)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The hearing calendared for September 12, 2022, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. The Court therefore denies the Motion as moot.; denying #16 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File. (See document for further details). (aco)
September 6, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #19 , First COUNTERCLAIM against Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Counter-Defendant Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company.(Roberto, Christina)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCHEDULING MEETING OFCOUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson: ( Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (et)
August 23, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Defendant Zalman N., Inc., Zalman T. Nemtzov.(Attorney Paul D Bojic added to party Zalman T. Nemtzov(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Bojic added to party Zalman N., Inc.(pty:dft))(Bojic, Paul)
August 4, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, upon Defendant Zalman T. Nemtzov acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Paul D. Bojic, Attorney. (Walrath, Isaac)
August 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, upon Defendant Zalman N., Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Paul D. Bojic, Attorney. (Walrath, Isaac)
August 2, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Roberto, #2 Declaration of Isaac Walrath, #3 Exhibits 1-6, #4 Proposed Order) (Walrath, Isaac)
July 29, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Isaac Walrath counsel for Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. Adding Isaac Walrath as counsel of record for Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attorney Isaac Walrath added to party Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Walrath, Isaac)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Zalman T. Nemtzov. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Zalman N., Inc. (aco)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS]. (aco)
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Roberto, Christina)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Roberto, Christina)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
May 4, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Roberto, Christina)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Roberto, Christina)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Assurant, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Roberto, Christina)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Roberto, Christina)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33242340 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Christina Roberto added to party Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Roberto, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company v. Zalman N., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christina Roberto
Represented By: Raymond J Tittmann
Represented By: Isaac Walrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zalman N., Inc.
Represented By: Paul D Bojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zalman T. Nemtzov
Represented By: Paul D Bojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: James Burgess
Represented By: James M Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?