James Paul v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: James Paul
Defendant: FCA US, LLC, Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03039
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES #32 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : Plaintiff JAMES PAUL and Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY have agreed Ford will pay $13,500.00 to resolve Plaintiff's attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Accordingly, the Court hereby enters an ORDER for Defendant to satisfy reasonable fees, costs and expenses for $13,500.00 to resolve Plaintiff's attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Payment is to be made to counsel for Plaintiff within 60 days of entry of this Order. (lc)
August 7, 2023 Filing 32 Joint STIPULATION for Order Attorneys Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER UPON STIPULATION CONTINUING FILING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES TO AUGUST 11, 2023 #30 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
July 5, 2023 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION to Continue JURISDICTION from July 11, 2023 to August 11, 2023 filed by plaintiff James Paul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna)
June 27, 2023 Filing 29 JUDGMENT #28 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff JAMES PAUL accepted Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 on June 7, 2023. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $90,000.00 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. Any motion from Plaintiff for fees and costs shall be filed in accordance with the requirements set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d). This order shall constitute the FINAL JUDGMENT of the Court. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
June 23, 2023 Filing 28 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff James Paul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgement) (Dolin, Tionna)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER #26 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 6/30/2023; Motion hearing cutoff 8/10/2023; Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/10/2023 (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
April 20, 2023 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule the Scheduling Order filed by James Paul James Paul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael L Tracy added to party James Paul (pty:pla))(Tracy, Michael)
April 18, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff James Paul. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party James Paul (pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
October 19, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of address by Brian C Vanderhoof attorney for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Changing attorneys address to 45 Fremont Street, Suite 3000, San Francisco, CA 94105-2256. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. For ADR Procedure No 3, counsel are responsible for contacting the private mediator at the appropriate time to arrange for further proceedings. (lom)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates: 09/26/23 Trial at 9:00 a.m.; 09/18/23 Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 p.m.; 09/06/23 Final Pretrial Conference at 2:30 p.m. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. (lom)
August 1, 2022 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Plaintiff James Paul.. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for August 15, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
June 15, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; BlackRock, Inc., The Vanguard Group. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
June 15, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Vanderhoof, Brian)
May 27, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of summons and complaint returned executed 21 days. The cited correct event will prompt filer for required information as to who, type of service, date etc. All missing due to incorrect event. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 26, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff James Paul, re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 05/25/2022. (Law, Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause #12 . The Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (lc) Modified on 5/24/2022 (lc).
May 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The party's name is inverted and should be James Paul. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Daniel Law re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #10 filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Law, Daniel)
May 20, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff James Paul. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiff James Paul for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party James Paul (pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, by May 20, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely respond to this order will be construed as a concession that the Court lacks diversityjurisdiction and shall result in dismissal of the case without prejudice, without further warning. (lc)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (lh)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Paul, identifying James Paul. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33248163 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff James Paul. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A - Ford F-150 Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party James Paul (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Paul v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Michael L Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Jonathan Won
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?