Tamara Wareka v. KARYNG, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS, Tamara Wareka and Tamara Williams
Defendant: KARYNG, LLC, KARYN GROSSMAN, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03597
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
2 Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Karyn Grossman, KARYNG, LLC, identifying Karyn L. Grossman, M.D., Inc.. (Gordee, Alan)
July 20, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendants Karyn Grossman, KARYNG, LLC.(Attorney Alan Jay Gordee added to party Karyn Grossman(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Jay Gordee added to party KARYNG, LLC(pty:dft))(Gordee, Alan)
June 27, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Karyn Grossman, KARYNG, LLC, #16 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service re Defendant KARYYG, LLC., indicates service was personally served upon Lorraine Prado, front desk employee and doesn't indicate if person is the authorized agent for service of process for the LLC, not was proof service mailed upon any defendant(s). (shb)
June 27, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Karyn Grossman, KARYNG, LLC filed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan E. Carreon, #2 Proposed Entry of Default) (Carreon, Ryan)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-108) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03597-SSS-ASx. (et)
June 17, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka, upon Defendant Karyn Grossman served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraina Prado, Front Desk Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew)
June 17, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka, upon Defendant KARYNG, LLC served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraina Prado, Front Desk Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew)
May 31, 2022 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE MAAME EWUSI-MENSAH FRIMPONG. (kd)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. The document(s) should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs.. (sh)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Karyn Grossman, KARYNG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Karyn Grossman) (sh)
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
May 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Tamara Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tamara Williams. (Higbee, Mathew)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS, (Higbee, Mathew)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Higbee, Mathew)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Higbee, Mathew)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33364098 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamara Wareka v. KARYNG, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Wareka
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Represented By: Ryan E Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Williams
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Represented By: Ryan E Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARYNG, LLC
Represented By: Alan Jay Gordee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARYN GROSSMAN
Represented By: Alan Jay Gordee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?