Dan C. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dan C.
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross, Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan and Directors Guild of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv03647
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
June 24, 2022 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #14 filed by Defendant Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan.(Slaught, Kathleen)
May 31, 2022 Filing 35 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (sh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 4:22-cv-00980-YGR, from California Northern District. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-03647 FLA (AFMx). (sh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 31 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
May 26, 2022 case electronically transmitted to the Central District of California. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #16 MOTION TO TRANSFER. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing previously set for 5/17/2022 is vacated. The Court will reset if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 27 Supplemental Brief re #24 Order - Plaintiff Dan C.'s Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed byDan C.. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 5/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 26 Statement with Respect to the Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue re #24 Order filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 5/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 25 Supplemental Brief re #24 Order - Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan's Supplemental Briefing in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed byDirectors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Supplemental Briefing due by 5/10/2022. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/3/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue ) filed byDirectors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan. (Theurer, Nolan) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue ) filed byDan C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Lilienstein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan identifying corporate parents WellPoint California Servicess, Inc., Anthem Holding Corp., Anthem, Inc., ; Corporate Disclosure (Theurer, Nolan) (Filed on 4/13/2022) Modified on 4/14/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc., Corporate Parent WellPoint California Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Anthem Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan, Corporate Parent Directors Guild of America, Inc. for Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 4/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 Answer to FIRST Amended Complaint #14 by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 4/11/2022) Modified on 4/12/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/22/2022. Replies due by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lisa Read in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/8/2022) Modified on 4/11/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan. Filed by Dan C.. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 3/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Directors Guild of America, Inc. by Dan C. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 3/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan to Respond to re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan. (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant Directors Guild Of America, Inc. To Respond To Complaint filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc.. (Moorhead, John) (Filed on 3/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Per sons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/03/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company.. (Kozaczuk, Peter) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan, Directors Guild of America, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF THE EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME SECURITY ACT OF 1974 (ERISA); BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ENFORCEMENT AND CLARIFICATION OF RIGHTS; PREJUDGMENT AND POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16914824). Filed by Dan C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/17/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan C. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan C.
Represented By: David M Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie J. Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Chad R. Fuller
Represented By: Peter Jacob Kozaczuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Guild of America - Producer Health Plan
Represented By: Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Represented By: Nolan Richard Theurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Guild of America Inc
Represented By: John Paul Moorhead
Represented By: Lisa Charlotte Demidovich
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?