Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. and Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant, Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant, Peruchicha, LLC an unknown business entity d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant, Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant, Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias individually doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant and Peruchicha, LLC an unknown business entity doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant
Case Number: 2:2022cv03760
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 521 Violations of Cable Communications Act of 1984
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 34 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant, Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias individually doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant, Peruchicha, LLC an unknown business entity doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant (shb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 33 Amended REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants All Defendants filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default) (Riley, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 15, 2022 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 13, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants All Defendants #28 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The state statute/code under which the defendant was served with the summons and complaint is not indicated on the proof of service. (shb)
July 12, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants All Defendants filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default) (Riley, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Peruchicha, LLC served on 6/15/2022, answer due 7/6/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 8, 2022 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias served on 6/15/2022, answer due 7/6/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 8, 2022 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido served on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Peruchicha, LLC. (shb)
June 10, 2022 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido. (shb)
June 10, 2022 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias. (shb)
June 9, 2022 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 9, 2022 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 9, 2022 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 , Summons Request #16 , Summons Request #17 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The Caption re defendant(s) must have at least one defendant named (see attached) if there are too many defendants to add. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (shb)
June 7, 2022 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #13 , Summons Request #12 , Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Re-submit with the corrections made.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (shb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Josephine Staton, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 21-01, all related Innovative Sports Management, Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 11-7395-TJH (PLAx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33402089 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc.(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peruchicha, LLC an unknown business entity d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauricio Eduardo Valencia Caraballido individually and d/b/a Peru Chicha Restaurant doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Eduardo Carhuamaca Arias individually doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peruchicha, LLC an unknown business entity doing business as Peru Chicha Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?