Nataly Lopez v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nataly Lopez
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Victor Daniels
Case Number: 2:2022cv03778
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
2 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Nataly Lopez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Nataly Lopez(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
January 5, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Victor Daniels has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for December 1, 2022 is hereby VACATED. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/14/2024 at 9:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 3/1/2024 at 8:30 AM. The last date to conduct settlement conference (court's mediation panel) is 12/6/2023. (See document for further details) (yl)
November 18, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. Amendment to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #19 (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
November 17, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 1, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
August 31, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 14 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 31, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
August 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-03778 MEMF(JPRx). (rn)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (es)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/13/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (sh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez, (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33404330 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Nataly Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Nataly Lopez(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nataly Lopez v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nataly Lopez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Victor Daniels
Represented By: Victor J Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?