EVO Brands, LLC et al v. Al Khalifa Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: EVO Brands, LLC and PVG2, LLC
Defendant: Al Khalifa Group LLC, Overseek Investments, LLC, Xtra Ecig LLC, Mohammad Khalifa, Abbas Khalifa and Omar Fdawi
Case Number: 2:2022cv03909
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mohammad Khalifa answer now due 8/10/2022; Overseek Investments, LLC answer now due 8/10/2022; Al Khalifa Group LLC answer now due 8/10/2022; Xtra Ecig LLC answer now due 8/10/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Mohammad Khalifa; Overseek Investments, LLC; Al Khalifa Group LLC; Xtra Ecig LLC.(Attorney Milord A. Keshishian added to party Al Khalifa Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Milord A. Keshishian added to party Mohammad Khalifa(pty:dft), Attorney Milord A. Keshishian added to party Overseek Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Milord A. Keshishian added to party Xtra Ecig LLC(pty:dft))(Keshishian, Milord)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Shufflebarger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC and PVG2, LLC, designating John A. Conkle as local counsel #16 . (gk)
June 16, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Shufflebarger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, PVG2, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33479917) filed by Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, PVG2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Conkle, John)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eric Heyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EVO BRANDS, LLC and PVG2, LLC, designating John Conkie as local counsel #14 . (iv)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric N. Heyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, PVG2, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33459939) filed by Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, PVG2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Conkle, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 STATEMENT re Notices of Pro Hac Vice Applications Due for Eric N. Heyer [ Dkt 10] and for Carrie A. Shufflebarger [Dkt 11] filed by Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, PVG2, LLC re: Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #10 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #11 . (Conkle, John)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Shufflebarger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric N. Heyer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Al Khalifa Group LLC, Omar Fdawi, Abbas Khalifa, Mohammad Khalifa, Overseek Investments, LLC. (lh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by EVO Brands, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, PVG2, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Conkle, John)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC and PVG2, LLC and Defendants Al Khalifa Group LLC, Overseek Investments, LLC, Xtra Ecig LLC, Mohammad Khalifa, Abbas Khalifa, Omar Fdawi. (Conkle, John)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, PVG2, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Conkle, John)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, PVG2, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Conkle, John)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33433823 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs EVO Brands, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, PVG2, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Attorney John Allan Conkle added to party EVO Brands, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:pla), Attorney John Allan Conkle added to party PVG2, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:pla))(Conkle, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVO Brands, LLC et al v. Al Khalifa Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVO Brands, LLC
Represented By: John Allan Conkle
Represented By: Zachary T Page
Represented By: Carrie A. Shufflebarger
Represented By: Eric N. Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVG2, LLC
Represented By: John Allan Conkle
Represented By: Zachary T Page
Represented By: Carrie A. Shufflebarger
Represented By: Eric N. Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Khalifa Group LLC
Represented By: Stephanie V. Trice
Represented By: Milord A. Keshishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overseek Investments, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie V. Trice
Represented By: Milord A. Keshishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtra Ecig LLC
Represented By: Stephanie V. Trice
Represented By: Milord A. Keshishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Khalifa
Represented By: Stephanie V. Trice
Represented By: Milord A. Keshishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbas Khalifa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Fdawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?