Raymont Skaggs v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raymont Skaggs
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03943
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 37 JUDGMENT #36 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $126,630.00 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
November 13, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a)) (Dolin, Tionna)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (DKT. #27 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Pretrial Conference from 12/18/2023 at 3:00 p.m. to 12/15/2023 at 11:30 a.m. The hearing will proceed in-person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Raymont Skaggs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Raymont Skaggs(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the Court's May 11, 2023 Scheduling Order #27 . If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Setting additional or alternative dates may be especially appropriate in class actions, patent cases, or cases for benefits under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 ("ERISA"). Please refer to the Courts Standing Order for Newly Assigned Civil Cases for requirements for specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to chambers, settlement, and other matters pertaining to all civil cases. See order for additional information. (lom)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
June 27, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. Filed by plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Raymont Skaggs(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-041) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03943 WLH(RAOx). (rn)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Amended Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates #26 ., The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 12/18/2023 at 3:00 PM. Trial is continued to 1/16/2024 at 8:30 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 10, 2023 Filing 26 Renewed STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Related Dates from Currently Set to As set forth in the stipulation. Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 24 filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Raymont Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
May 9, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Raymont Skaggs(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The stipulation #23 is denied. The proposed dates must comply with the time frames in the weeks before trial column and the required days of the week in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates in the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference: a Monday (not a holiday) for the pretrial conference and last day for hearing motions and a Tuesday (not a holiday) for trial. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
April 28, 2023 Filing 23 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Related Dates from Currently Set to Approximately 60 days filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Raymont Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/31/23. (pk)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2023 at 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM. (pk)
August 24, 2022 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
August 22, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Due to a clerical error, docket no. 16 was published without a PDF attachment. The Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/8/2022 at 11:00 AM is continued to 8/29/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 1, 2022 Filing 12 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certifcate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 1, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pg)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Raymont Skaggs, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33441694 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Raymont Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Raymont Skaggs(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymont Skaggs v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymont Skaggs
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?