Michael Sinel v. Genexa, Inc. et al
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Counter Defendant: MICHAEL SINEL and MSSMD Investments, LLC
Counter Claimant: GENEXA, INC., MAX SPIELBERG and DAVID JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2022cv03961
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Counterclaim #15 filed by Counter-Defendant MSSMD Investments, LLC, Michael Sinel.(Attorney Robert Steven Ross added to party MSSMD Investments, LLC(pty:cd))(Ross, Robert)
July 21, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Counter Claimants Genexa, Inc., David Johnson, Max Spielberg, Defendants Genexa, Inc., David Johnson, Max Spielberg.. (Thomas, Wendy)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #18 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details* (gga)
July 15, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counter-Claim filed by Counter-Defendant Michael Sinel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Ross re: extension for response to counter-claim, #2 Proposed Order on stipulation for extension of time to file responsive pleadings) (Ross, Robert)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS Genexa, Inc., David Johnson, Max Spielberg, re Counterclaim #15 AGAINST MSSMD INVESTMENTS, INC. served on JUNE 28, 2022. (Thomas, Wendy)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #13 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference for all parties set for August, 4, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6D of this court is continued to August 11, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. (lom)
June 24, 2022 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM against COUNTER DEFENDANTS Michael Sinel, MSSMD Investments, LLC; JURY DEMAND, filed by DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS David Johnson, Max Spielberg, Genexa, Inc..(Thomas, Wendy)
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by DEFENDANTS Genexa, Inc., David Johnson, Max Spielberg.(Thomas, Wendy)
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from August 4, 2022 to August 11, 2022 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 filed by DEFENDANTS Genexa, Inc., David Johnson, Max Spielberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE)(Thomas, Wendy)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME #11 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details* (gga)
June 17, 2022 Filing 11 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Genexa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy M. Thomas, #2 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Wendy)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/21/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
June 10, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Genexa, Inc., David Johnson, Max Spielberg, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 MAIL served on June 10, 2022. (Thomas, Wendy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
June 9, 2022 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Michael Sinel in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/6/2022, attached as Exhibit 8. (jtil)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Iris Rivera REGARDING SERVICE filed by Defendants GENEXA, INC., DAVID JOHNSON, MAX SPIELBERG. (Thomas, Wendy)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS GENEXA, INC., DAVID JOHNSON, MAX SPIELBERG, identifying MICHAEL SINEL; GENEXA, INC.; MAX SPIELBERG; DAVID JOHNSON; NATIONWIDE. (Thomas, Wendy)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants GENEXA, INC., DAVID JOHNSON, MAX SPIELBERG. (Thomas, Wendy)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT-SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE, case number 21SMCV01977 Receipt No: ACACDC-33445503 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANTS DAVID JOHNSON, MAX SPIELBERG, GENEXA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF WENDY M. THOMAS IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION, #2 COMPLAINT, #3 SUMMONS, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE, #6 NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, #7 NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER, #8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #9 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - GENEXA, INC., #10 DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE, #11 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - DAVID JOHNSON, #12 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) (Attorney Wendy M Thomas added to party GENEXA, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy M Thomas added to party DAVID JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy M Thomas added to party MAX SPIELBERG(pty:dft))(Thomas, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Sinel v. Genexa, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MICHAEL SINEL
Represented By: Robert Steven Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MSSMD Investments, LLC
Represented By: Robert Steven Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: GENEXA, INC.
Represented By: Wendy M Thomas
Represented By: Betty Thi Huynh
Represented By: Justin Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MAX SPIELBERG
Represented By: Wendy M Thomas
Represented By: Betty Thi Huynh
Represented By: Justin Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DAVID JOHNSON
Represented By: Wendy M Thomas
Represented By: Betty Thi Huynh
Represented By: Justin Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?