Cheryl Brandon v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Brandon
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03978
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Cheryl Brandon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Cheryl Brandon(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 8, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Cheryl Brandon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Cheryl Brandon(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. Steven Whang is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 4, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Whang counsel for Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. Adding Steven Whang as counsel of record for Cheryl Brandon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Brandon. (Attorney Steven Whang added to party Cheryl Brandon(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
July 18, 2022 Filing 20 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (sh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error this case is a Multi-District Litigation. Docket entries no. 14, 16, and 17 were docketed in error. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 5:22-cv-03065-EJD, from California Northern District. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-03978 AB (PVCx). (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-66) - Transferring case to Central District of California. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2022. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of this notice has been email to Plaintiff's counsel appearing on the Complaint. [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 5/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/8/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Pollard Vilchez (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Marie Clayton (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding [PER L.R. 3-13] (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plans) for Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 22CV395388. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17207587). Filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of TMC iso of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit D to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit E to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit F to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Gto TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit H to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit I to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit J to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit K to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #13 Exhibit L to TMC Decl iso of Notice of Removal, #14 Civil Cover Sheet iso of Notice of Removal, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 5/25/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheryl Brandon v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Brandon
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?