Tarek Al Warhani et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Tarek Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Mazen Al Warhani and Wael Al Warhani
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Los Angeles Asylum Office, David Radel, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Matthew D. Emrich and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 2:2022cv03982
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant Christopher A. Wray served on 6/16/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant David Radel served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant Ted H. Kim served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant Matthew D. Emrich served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 10, 2022 Filing 26 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Christopher A. Wray. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 25 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 24 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant David Radel. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 23 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 22 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 21 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ted H. Kim. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ur M. Jaddou. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Matthew D. Emrich. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (car)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
June 10, 2022 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Jean P. Rosenbluth. New Case Number 2:22-cv-03982-SB-JPRx. (car)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mazen Al Warhani, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani, Nagham Arar. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33446315 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Mazen Al Warhani, Nagham Arar, Tarek Al Warhani, Wael Al Warhani. (Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Mazen Al Warhani (pty:pla), Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Tarek Al Warhani (pty:pla), Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Wael Al Warhani (pty:pla), Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Nagham Arar(pty:pla))(Jubran, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarek Al Warhani et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarek Al Warhani
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagham Arar
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazen Al Warhani
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wael Al Warhani
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Asylum Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Radel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Emrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?