DR. DR. B.L. Rosenfeld et al v. Ashlee C. Clark et al
Plaintiff: B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR., J. GLASS and Dr. Dr. B. L. Rosenfeld
Defendant: ASHLEE CLARK, JILL A. VANDER BORGHT, JOSEPH McDOUGALL, LAURA E. INLOW, LEONORE C. KELLY, COLLISON, DAEHNKE, INLOW & GRECO, Ashlee C. Clark, Lenore C. Kelly, Collison, Daehnke, Inlow and Greco and Ten Unknown Named Defendants
Case Number: 2:2022cv04209
Filed: June 18, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Special Motion to Strike and Request for Attorney Fees Pursuant 425.16 filed by Defendants Ashlee C. Clark, Collison, Daehnke, Inlow and Greco, Laura E. Inlow, Lenore C. Kelly, Joseph McDougall, Jill A. Vander Borght. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 Proposed Order) (Inlow, Laura)
July 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF B. L. Rosenfeld. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Yagman, Stephen)
July 23, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by PLAINTIFFS B. L. Rosenfeld(Yagman, Stephen)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Pursuant to CCP425.16 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Ashlee C. Clark, Collison, Daehnke, Inlow and Greco, Laura E. Inlow, Lenore C. Kelly, Joseph McDougall, Jill A. Vander Borght. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order) (Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Ashlee C. Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Collison, Daehnke, Inlow and Greco(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Laura E. Inlow(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Lenore C. Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Joseph McDougall(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Jill A. Vander Borght(pty:dft)) (Inlow, Laura)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-04209-GW-PDx. (aco)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ashlee C. Clark, Collison, Daehnke, Inlow and Greco, Laura E. Inlow, Lenore C. Kelly, Joseph McDougall, Ten Unknown Named Defendants, Jill A. Vander Borght. (lh)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
June 18, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR.. (Yagman, Stephen)
June 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by PLAINTIFFS B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR.. Related Case(s): none (Yagman, Stephen)
June 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR., (Yagman, Stephen)
June 18, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFFS B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR.. (Yagman, Stephen)
June 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33493817 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFFS B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR.. (Attorney Stephen Yagman added to party B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR.(pty:pla))(Yagman, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DR. DR. B.L. Rosenfeld et al v. Ashlee C. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. L. ROSENFELD, DR. DR.
Represented By: Stephen Yagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. GLASS
Represented By: Stephen Yagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Dr. B. L. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Stephen Yagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEE CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL A. VANDER BORGHT
Represented By: Laura Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH McDOUGALL
Represented By: Laura Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA E. INLOW
Represented By: Laura Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONORE C. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLISON, DAEHNKE, INLOW & GRECO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashlee C. Clark
Represented By: Laura Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenore C. Kelly
Represented By: Laura Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collison, Daehnke, Inlow and Greco
Represented By: Laura Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Unknown Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?