Sonia Barragan v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sonia Barragan
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv04275
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Eastern
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-101) transferring case to the Central District of California for inclusion in MDL 2151 in re: Toyota Motor Corp, unintended acceleration marketing, sales practices, and products liability litigation and assigned to the Honorable James V Selna (signed by Clerk of the Panel) (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 101 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 6/13/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-161-MJT from Eastern District of Texas (Beaumont). Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 10-2151. (ghap) Modified on 6/27/2022 (ghap).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant TEMA's deadline to answer, move against or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is now June 27, 2022. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/1/2022. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Viehman, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2022: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS re-issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS REISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8882958.), filed by Sonia Barragan individually and as representative of the estate of Adrian Barragan Castellanos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(Kirchmer, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/20/2022 with flattened image) (bjc, ). Modified on 4/20/2022 (bjc, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
April 20, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sonia Barragan. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
April 20, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/27/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonia Barragan v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Barragan
Represented By: Christopher T Kirchmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc
Represented By: J. Karl Viehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?