Veribi, LLC v. Compass Mining Inc
Plaintiff: Veribi, LLC
Defendant: Compass Mining Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv04537
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Veribi, LLC, upon Defendant Compass Mining Inc served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Engle, Alan)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Compass Mining Inc. (sh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Veribi, LLC. (Engle, Alan)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Veribi, LLC (Engle, Alan)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Veribi, LLC. (Engle, Alan)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33569426 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Veribi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs to Complaint) (Attorney Alan E Engle added to party Veribi, LLC(pty:pla))(Engle, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veribi, LLC v. Compass Mining Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veribi, LLC
Represented By: Alan E Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Mining Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?