NBCUniversal Media, LLC et al v. Jay Kennette Media Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Television LLC and Universal Studios Licensing LLC
Defendant: Jay Kennette Media Group LLC, Gooder Labs, LLC and Kenneth Talbert
Case Number: 2:2022cv04541
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. upon Kenneth Talbert waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth Talbert. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. upon Gooder Labs, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Gooder Labs, LLC. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. upon Jay Kennette Media Group LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Jay Kennette Media Group LLC. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kenneth Talbert. (lh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Gooder Labs, LLC. (lh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Jay Kennette Media Group LLC. (lh)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC identifying Comcast Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC, identifying Comcast Corporation. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Gooder Labs, LLC, #2 Summons - Kenneth Talbert)(Thomas, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Thomas, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33570120 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Studios Licensing LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Attorney Andrew Jackson Thomas added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Jackson Thomas added to party Universal Studios Licensing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Jackson Thomas added to party Universal Television LLC(pty:pla))(Thomas, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBCUniversal Media, LLC et al v. Jay Kennette Media Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jackson Thomas
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Television LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jackson Thomas
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Studios Licensing LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jackson Thomas
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Kennette Media Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gooder Labs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?