Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv04593
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND JUDGMENT #35 by Judge R. Gary Klausner, the Court hereby enters a Judgment in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 and awards $13,500 in Plaintiff's attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation. All pending dates in this action are vacated. The clerk shall close this action.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
June 9, 2023 Filing 35 REQUEST for Judgment for Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement #33 filed on 5/26/2023. The parties are hereby notified that they are not relieved of any deadlines or Court appearances until a dismissal of the action is filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 26, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
April 18, 2023 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Amend the Scheduling Order [DE #30 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES the Parties' Joint Stipulation. See Civil Minutes for further specifics. (jp)
April 14, 2023 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION for Order Joint Stipulation to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mehgan Gallagher, #2 Proposed Order)(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
November 22, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/19/2023. (jre)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2023, 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2023, 09:00 AM. (jre)
November 7, 2022 Filing 26 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2022. Discovery cut-off 4/19/2023. Motions due by 5/3/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2023, 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2023, 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (jre)
October 24, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING R26 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (kmh)
September 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mehgan Gallagher on behalf of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Gallagher, Mehgan)
September 22, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 22, 2022 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Daimler North America Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 22, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler North America Corporation. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER On Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #18 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff'sFirst Amended Complaint is hereby extended to 9/22/2022. FURTHER EXTENSION DISFAVORED. (jp)
September 2, 2022 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC answer now due 9/22/2022, re Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mehgan Gallagher, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Soheyl Tahsildoost added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
August 24, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi, upon Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 17, 2022 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #13 as to Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (jp)
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 22, 2022 Filing 14 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi, (Law, Daniel)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant FCA US LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi(Law, Daniel)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner re: Notices to Filer of Deficiencies in Complaint #5 and Lack of Certification and Notice of Interested Parties #9 . Plaintiff has until July 22, 2022, 3:00 pm, to file an amended complaint and a Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. Failure to file an amended complaint by that date will result in dismissal of the action for failure to state a claim against FCA US, LLC. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): do not match the caption of the complaint. These documents should be corrected and re-filed. (et)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et)
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
July 5, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33578523 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammadreza Hajiabbaskhayattabrizi v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMADREZA HAJIABBASKHAYATTABRIZI
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Soheyl Tahsildoost
Represented By: Mehgan Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?