Marquise Bailey v. Refoua L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Marquise Bailey
Defendant: Refoua LLC and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04671
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv)
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Marquise Baileyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court has presided over hundreds of cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. Most of these cases are brought by a small number of repeat plaintiffs and an even smaller number of law firms. Therefore, the Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases filed by the So. Cal. Firm. See minute order for deadlines. (lom)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Therefore, to assist this Court in its duty, Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before JULY 26, 2022. (lom)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Refoua LLC. (jtil)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Marquise Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marquise Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-33599278 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Marquise Bailey(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquise Bailey v. Refoua L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquise Bailey
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refoua LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?