Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. WSP USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: WSP USA, Inc., Does 1-10 and Aetna Life Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2022cv04814
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Filing 16 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
August 30, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #14 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant WSP USA, Inc..(Herman, Jonathan)
August 1, 2022 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants WSP USA, Inc., Aetna Life Ins. Co. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #11 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 8/22/2022, in accordance with the Stipulation. Within 30 days of the date on which Plaintiff files its amended complaint, Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's amended complaint. (gk)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant WSP USA, Inc., identifying WSP Global Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Herman, Jonathan)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 30 days after Plaintiff files Amended Complaint filed by Defendant WSP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 . Document # 4 and 5 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the Notice To Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program and Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States MagistrateJudge with wrong spelling of plaintiff name on forms. (ghap)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
July 14, 2022 Filing 5 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 7/14/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 7] Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) Modified on 7/14/2022 (ghap).
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 7/14/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 7] NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) Modified on 7/14/2022 (ghap).
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant WSP USA, Inc.. (Herman, Jonathan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, case number 22STCV18760 Receipt No: ACACDC-33629207 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant WSP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman added to party WSP USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Herman, Jonathan)
July 14, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, WSP USA, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/8/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. WSP USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSP USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?