Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC and Healthcare Ally Management of California LLC
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04838
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation.(Nalty, Sean)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Bank of America Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER AND FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND THERETO by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Upon Stipulation #10 , the Court GRANTS plaintiff leave to file a First Amended Complaint in this matter on or before 8/17/2022 and Defendant shall have until 9/7/2022 to file a response to the First Amended Complaint. (gk)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and for Additional Time to Respond Thereto filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nalty, Sean)
July 18, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint as to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation.(Nalty, Sean)
July 15, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 served on July 15, 2022. (Nalty, Sean)
July 15, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh)
July 14, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF Summons and COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Does.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC.[FILED IN STATE COURT 06/07/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
July 14, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC, upon Defendant Bank of America Corporation served on 6/14/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 06/16/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Nalty, Sean)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation, identifying Bank of America Corporation. (Nalty, Sean)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation. (Nalty, Sean)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 22STLC03832 Receipt No: ACACDC-33633410 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen McCrarey) (Attorney Sean P Nalty added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft))(Nalty, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Care Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?