Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp.
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corp., Does 1-10 and Space Exploration Technologies
Case Number: 2:2022cv05098
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANT SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #11 AS MOOT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 14 ), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for October 21, 2022, is hereby VACATED. SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
September 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clarissa A. Kang in Support of Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Clarissa A. Kang's Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Clarissa A. Kang's Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Kang, Clarissa)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby approves the parties' Stipulation #9 and ORDERS that Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp. shall have up to and until 8/30/2022 to file and serve its response, by motion, answer, or otherwise, to Plaintiff's Complaint. (gk)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 30, 2022 filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clarissa A. Kang, #2 Proposed Order)(Kang, Clarissa)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
July 22, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Space Exploration Technologies Corp (erroneously sued as Space Exploration Technologies), Does 1-10. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp., served on July 22, 2022. (Kang, Clarissa)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp., (Kang, Clarissa)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Kang, Clarissa)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV20328 Receipt No: ACACDC-33681267 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Clarissa Ann Kang added to party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.(pty:dft))(Kang, Clarissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corp.
Represented By: Clarissa Ann Kang
Represented By: Brian Douglas Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies
Represented By: Brian Douglas Murray
Represented By: Clarissa Ann Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?