Corey Sipkin v. Ahn Fire Digital Inc.
Plaintiff: Corey Sipkin
Defendant: Ahn Fire Digital Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv05157
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENLARGING THE TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT AND FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DEFENDANT BY WAY OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE (DKT. #11 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as follows: Plaintiff's time to effect service is hereby extended for a period of 30 days from the date of this Order. (See document for further details)(yl)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Corey Sipkin. upon Ahn Fire Digital Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/20/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Edward E. Alon. (Sanders, Craig)
September 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Service by Publication /unopposed motion for extension of time to effectuate service and to authorize service by publication or alternate means filed by Plaintiff Corey Sipkin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig B. Sanders in Support of motion to enlarge time to effectuate service and to approve service by publication or other means, #2 Exhibit 1 to Sanders Declaration - Defendant California Secretary of State Listing, #3 Exhibit 2 to Sanders Declaration - Declaration of process server, #4 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Craig)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ahn Fire Digital Inc.. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Corey Sipkin, identifying SANDERS LAW GROUP, Craig B. Sanders, Ahn Fire Digital Inc.. (Sanders, Craig)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Corey Sipkin. (Sanders, Craig)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Corey Sipkin. (Sanders, Craig)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Corey Sipkin. (Sanders, Craig)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33696633 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Corey Sipkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph) (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Corey Sipkin(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corey Sipkin v. Ahn Fire Digital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Sipkin
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahn Fire Digital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?