Wendy Jenkins v. Ford Motor Company
Petitioner: Wendy Jenkins
Respondent: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv05191
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Petitioner Wendy Jenkins. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Wendy Jenkins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Wendy Jenkins. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Wendy Jenkins(pty:pet))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 8, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Petitioner Wendy Jenkins. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Wendy Jenkins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Wendy Jenkins. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Wendy Jenkins(pty:pet))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (jtil)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 69 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/27/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:22-cv-00763 from USDC Eastern District of California, Sacramento. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB (PVCx). (jtil)
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. Electronic Transfer Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/28/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Motor Company served on 7/6/2022, answer due 7/27/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/28/2022.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/28/2022.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Motor Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, Apc* *1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/28/2022.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company by Wendy Jenkins. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10217049) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 5/6/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/28/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wendy Jenkins v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wendy Jenkins
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?