Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Cumulus Media Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: Cumulus Media Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv05196
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2022 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from October 17, 2022 to December 12, 2022 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
September 22, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Consideration of Parties' Selection of Private Mediator filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc..(Williams, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2022 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Information)(Williams, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan & Plan Summary, #2 Exhibit B - Denial of Benefits (Redacted), #3 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of April 10, 2023; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of April 17, 2023; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for May 19, 2023, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of June 20, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
September 8, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for September 19, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. The Court has entered a Protective Order in this action. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, this matter has been referred to private mediation. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 24, 2023. (aco)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court enters the following protective order: (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
September 6, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
September 2, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC.. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
September 2, 2022 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Cumulus Media Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO PERMIT FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation, VACATES Cumulus's deadline to answer the original Complaint in this matter, and ORDERS that Plaintiff shall have until September 2, 2022 to file an amended complaint. RE: Stipulation for Leave #13 . (aco)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and to Vacate Answer Deadline filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson. APPLICATION of Attorney David M. Pernini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cumulus Media Inc., designating Jeffrey N. Williams as local counsel.; granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney David M. Pernini. (aco)
August 8, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Pernini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cumulus Media Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33774259) filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cumulus Media Inc. answer now due 8/23/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc..(Williams, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David M Pernini. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
July 27, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, upon Defendant Cumulus Media Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/29/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 27, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cumulus Media Inc., Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. Filed in State Court on 6/22/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc., (Williams, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc.. (Williams, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV20371 Receipt No: ACACDC-33704828 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Cumulus Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Denning Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Williams Declaration, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jeffrey N. Williams added to party Cumulus Media Inc.(pty:dft))(Williams, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Cumulus Media Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumulus Media Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Williams
Represented By: David M. Pernini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?