GS Holistic, LLC v. Coco Tobacco Inc et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: Coco Tobacco Inc d/b/a Coco Tobacco, Babak Moghbel and Coco Tobacco Inc doing business as Coco Tobacco
Case Number: 2:2022cv05808
Filed: August 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Babak Moghbel. (aco)
August 24, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Coco Tobacco Inc. dba Coco Tobacco. (aco)
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Remaining Summons)(Leon, Tomas)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
August 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sh)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, identifying Chris Folkerts, GS Holistic, LLC, Leon Law LLP, Tomas Carlos Leon, CHAPMAN SMOKE TOBACCO, INC. d/b/a CHAPMAN SMOKE TOBACCO, AHD GHANEM, and NABIL HANNALLA. (Leon, Tomas)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
August 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
August 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33822526 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attorney Tomas Carlos Leon added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla))(Leon, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. Coco Tobacco Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Tomas Carlos Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coco Tobacco Inc d/b/a Coco Tobacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babak Moghbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coco Tobacco Inc doing business as Coco Tobacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?