Julian Ahab Joseph Nafal v. Mohsen Mohammad Gaber
Plaintiff: Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal
Defendant: Mohen Mohammed Gaber, Mohen Mohammad Jaber and Mohsen Mohammad Gaber
Case Number: 2:2022cv05912
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #16 as to Defendant Mohsen Mohammed Gaber. (jp)
September 30, 2022 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal. (Besser, Robert)
September 30, 2022 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Mohen Mohammed Gaber amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit License Agreement, #2 Exhibit Agency Contract, #3 Exhibit Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Amendment to Assignment Agreement)(Besser, Robert)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
August 29, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal. (Besser, Robert)
August 29, 2022 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal, identifying None. (Besser, Robert)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #10 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #11 . The following error(s) was found: Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties are Incomplete. (jp)
August 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal, identifying None. (Besser, Robert)
August 22, 2022 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal. (Besser, Robert)
August 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Item 2 Civil Cover Sheet and Item 3 Notice of Interested Parties are blank. Item 2 and 3 should be correctly e-filed. (et)
August 19, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mohen Mohammed Gaber. (et)
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
August 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahab Nafal. (Besser, Robert)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahab Nafal, identifying None. (Besser, Robert)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahab Nafal. (Besser, Robert)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33843924 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Julian Ahab Nafal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit License Agreement, #2 Exhibit Amendment to License Agreement, #3 Exhibit Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Assignment Agreement) (Attorney Robert S. Besser added to party Julian Ahab Nafal(pty:pla))(Besser, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julian Ahab Joseph Nafal v. Mohsen Mohammad Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohen Mohammed Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohen Mohammad Jaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohsen Mohammad Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Ahad Joseph Nafal
Represented By: Robert S. Besser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?