United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members et al v. CLG Family Fund, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members and Anna Marie Wiggins
Defendant: CLG FAMILY FUND, LLC, CALIFORNIA LANDMARK GROUP, A California Corporation, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, California Landmark Group and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv06077
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for November 28, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than November 21, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Verified Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants CLG Family Fund, LLC, California Landmark Group.(Attorney Niv Vladimir Davidovich added to party CLG Family Fund, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Niv Vladimir Davidovich added to party California Landmark Group(pty:dft))(Davidovich, Niv)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
August 29, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants CLG Family Fund, LLC, California Landmark Group. (sh)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying CLG FAMILY FUND, LLC; CALIFORNIA LANDMARK GROUP, A California Corporation. (Wakefield, David)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33882597 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Anna Marie Wiggins(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members et al v. CLG Family Fund, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Wiggins
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLG FAMILY FUND, LLC
Represented By: Charles Z Stein
Represented By: Niv Vladimir Davidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA LANDMARK GROUP, A California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Landmark Group
Represented By: Charles Z Stein
Represented By: Niv Vladimir Davidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?