Doroteo Hernandez v. Luis Alberto Alcaraz Lopez et al
Plaintiff: DOROTEO HERNANDEZ and Doroteo Hernandez an individual and resident of the State of California doing business as Dulces Pigui USA
Defendant: LUIS ALBERTO ALCARAZ LOPEZ, DISTRIBUIDORA DE DULCES PIGUI, S. DE R.L. DE CV., MEGA PG DISTRIBUTIONS, LLC, FERNANDO ACOSTA VALENZUELA, VICTOR FRANCO, TJ CANDY CORPORATION, INC. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv06673
Filed: September 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant TJ Candy Corporation, Inc. (aco)
October 3, 2022 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Victor Franco. (aco)
October 3, 2022 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Fernando Acosta Valenzuela. (aco)
October 3, 2022 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Mega PG Distributions, LLC. (aco)
October 3, 2022 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Distribuidora De Dulces Pigui, S. DE R.L. DE CV. (aco)
October 3, 2022 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Luis Alberto Alcaraz Lopez. (aco)
October 3, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez. (Welch, Kevin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez. (Welch, Kevin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez. (Welch, Kevin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez. (Welch, Kevin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez. (Welch, Kevin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez. (Welch, Kevin)
October 3, 2022 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Doroteo Hernandez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welch, Kevin)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
September 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DOROTEO HERNANDEZ, (Welch, Kevin)
September 17, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by DOROTEO HERNANDEZ. (Welch, Kevin)
September 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DOROTEO HERNANDEZ. (Welch, Kevin)
September 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34001984 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff DOROTEO HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kevin Matthew Welch added to party DOROTEO HERNANDEZ(pty:pla))(Welch, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doroteo Hernandez v. Luis Alberto Alcaraz Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTEO HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doroteo Hernandez an individual and resident of the State of California doing business as Dulces Pigui USA
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS ALBERTO ALCARAZ LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRIBUIDORA DE DULCES PIGUI, S. DE R.L. DE CV.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGA PG DISTRIBUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERNANDO ACOSTA VALENZUELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR FRANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ CANDY CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?