Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Aetna Life Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Co. and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv06791
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #10 filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. (Ernster, Shannon)
November 11, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #10 filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #10 filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. (Ernster, Shannon)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&A ISO MTD, #2 Declaration ISO MTD, #3 Proposed Order) (Ernster, Shannon)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 Notice Confirming Notification to State Court of Removal filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. (Ernster, Shannon)
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aetna Life Insurance Co. answer now due 10/28/2022, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co..(Ernster, Shannon)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
September 21, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Does 1-10. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/9/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT NO.2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
September 21, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Does 1-10 amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/22/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](et)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co., identifying Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company; Aetna, Inc., parent of Aetna Life Insurance Company; CVS, ultimate parent of Aetna, Inc.; Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management LLC; and La Peer Surgery Center, third party medical provider. (Attorney Courtney C Hill added to party Aetna Life Insurance Co.(pty:dft))(Hill, Courtney)
September 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. (Ernster, Shannon)
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV18878 Receipt No: ACACDC-34022458 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Defendant's Removal, #2 Declaration ISO Defendant's Removal) (Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Aetna Life Insurance Co.(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Aetna Life Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Courtney C Hill
Represented By: Shannon Lissa Ernster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?