Scott Breitenstein v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Breitenstein
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv07204
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket No. 14) and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the November 14, 2022 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to December 2, 2022. A post-mediation status conference is set for June 1, 2023 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by May 29. All regular discovery will be completed by May 16, 2023. The pre-trial conference will be held on August 17, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The pre-trial conference will be held on August 17, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. See minute order for other deadlines. (lom)
November 10, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has reviewed the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket No. #14 ) and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the November 14, 2022 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. Separate Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 9, 2022 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 11/14/2022 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc... (Worthe, Todd)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for November 14, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than November 7, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc., identifying Plaintiff, Scott Breitenstein, Defendant, United Airlines, Inc., and Global Aerospace Inc.. (Worthe, Todd)
October 11, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc..(Attorney Todd Christopher Worthe added to party United Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Worthe, Todd)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scott Breitenstein, (McKay, John)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (ghap)
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Scott Breitenstein. (McKay, John)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scott Breitenstein. (McKay, John)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34093368 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Scott Breitenstein. (Attorney John Douglas McKay added to party Scott Breitenstein(pty:pla))(McKay, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Breitenstein v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Breitenstein
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mackenzie Cass Foellmer
Represented By: Todd Christopher Worthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?