United States of America v. Dusean Dawson
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dusean Dawson
Case Number: 2:2022cv07487
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Dusean Dawson waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Waiver of Service signed by 11-1-22. (Gill, Angela)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dusean Dawson. (sh)
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
October 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Conte, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Conte, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Robert F Conte added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Conte, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dusean Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Angela Gill
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusean Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?