Daniel Naftalovich v. Timothy Martella
Plaintiff: Daniel Naftalovich
Defendant: Timothy Martella
Case Number: 2:2022cv07531
Filed: October 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF THROUGH ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT SUBMISSION SYSTEM by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff does not have a pending action by which he may utilize EDSS to file documents in this case, and the Court will not accept for filing any of Plaintiff's documents submitted on November 29, 2022. If Plaintiff intends to file a new action, he must submit his documents without the previous case number. If submitted through EDSS, Plaintiff must request that a new case number be assigned. (iv)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #2 #3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Application is DENIED. Plaintiff's action is DISMISSED, without prejudice. (iv)
October 17, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
October 16, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by plaintiff Daniel Naftalovich. (Attachments: #1 Order to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (ghap)
October 16, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Orders and Preliminary Injunctions, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Naftalovich re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Regarding The Issued Domestic Violence Restraining Order and Its Proposed Renewal #2 . (ghap)
October 16, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re Regarding The Issued Domestic Violence Restraining Order and Its Proposed Renewal, filed by plaintiff Daniel Naftalovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue) (ghap)
October 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Timothy Martella. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G Rosenberg., filed by plaintiff Daniel Naftalovich. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Naftalovich v. Timothy Martella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Naftalovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Martella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?