Jerome Kern v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Kern
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, NewRez LLC, Western Progressive, LLC, Does 1 to 50, inclusive, U.S. Bank National Association and Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv07559
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John F. Walter. As a result of the parties failure to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as required by the Court's Order of October 20, 2022, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Scheduling Conference, currently on calendar for November 28, 2022, is VACA TED. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Yourish v. California Amplifier, 191 F.3d 983, 986-88 (9th Cir. 1999); Ferdik v. Bonzelet, 963 F.2d 1258, 1260 (9th Cir. 1992). IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 26 CONFERENCE #20 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
November 14, 2022 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 Conference from November 28, 2022 at 1:15pm to 30 days or as soon thereafter as is convenient for the Court to allow the Second Amended Complaint to be filed filed by Plaintiff Jerome Kern. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shapero, Sarah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Glenn J. Plattner re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 13 DECLARATION OF GLENN PLATTNER REGARDING THE PARTIES' OCTOBER 31, 2022 MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-3 filed by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC. (Plattner, Glenn)
October 28, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sarah Shapero re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jerome Kern. (Shapero, Sarah)
October 28, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Jerome Kern. (Shapero, Sarah)
October 27, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Glenn J. Plattner re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC. (Plattner, Glenn)
October 26, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer A. Jackson counsel for Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC. Jennifer Jackson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Jennifer Jackson. (Jackson, Jennifer)
October 26, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Glenn J Plattner counsel for Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC. Adding Glenn J. Plattner as counsel of record for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2; PHH Mortgage Corporation; Newrez LLC; and Western Progressive, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Glenn J. Plattner. (Attorney Glenn J Plattner added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn J Plattner added to party NewRez LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn J Plattner added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn J Plattner added to party Western Progressive, LLC(pty:dft))(Plattner, Glenn)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 Text Entry Order: Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jerome Kern filed on October 24, 2022 (Docket No. #12 ) is STRICKEN for failure to conduct a meaningful Local Rule 7-3 conference. If Defendant wishes to re-file the Motion, lead counsel shall meet and confer in person or by video by November 1, 2022. If the parties cannot resolve the issues raised in the Motion, within 3 days of the meet and confer, each party shall file a declaration setting forth the issues resolved at the conference and those issues that were not resolved with a detailed explanation of why those issues could not be resolved. If a Motion remains necessary, it shall not be filed until 2 days after each party files the declaration required by this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jerome Kern filed by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jerome Kern, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jerome Kern) (Root, David) Modified on 10/25/2022 (sr).
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT of Compliance With Local Rule 7-3 filed by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC re: Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 . (Root, David)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 28, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 14, 2022. (iv)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
October 17, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jerome Kern, upon Defendant NewRez LLC served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lai Saevang, person authorized to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/17/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 17, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, Does, NewRez LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jerome Kern. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 17, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, Does, NewRez LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Jerome Kern (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/15/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
October 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NewRez LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Western Progressive, LLC, (Root, David)
October 17, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants NewRez LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Western Progressive, LLC (Root, David)
October 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants NewRez LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Western Progressive, LLC. (Root, David)
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21PSCV00939 Receipt No: ACACDC-34166897 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Western Progressive, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25) (Attorney David James Root added to party NewRez LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David James Root added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David James Root added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David James Root added to party U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2(pty:dft), Attorney David James Root added to party Western Progressive, LLC(pty:dft))(Root, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerome Kern v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Kern
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Represented By: Stephanie Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-2
Represented By: David James Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: David James Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: David James Root
Represented By: Jennifer A. Jackson
Represented By: Glenn J Plattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: David James Root
Represented By: Glenn J Plattner
Represented By: Jennifer A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Represented By: David James Root
Represented By: Glenn J Plattner
Represented By: Jennifer A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Glenn J Plattner
Represented By: David James Root
Represented By: Jennifer A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?