David Cortes v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: David Cortes
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES and Does 1-100 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv08026
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Joshua Ganz counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Daniel J. Ganz as counsel of record for Defendant County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Daniel Joshua Ganz added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Ganz, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2024 at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet) (iv)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/12/2024. (iv)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the December 28, 2022, Scheduling Conference. Trial Order to be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 16, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Raymond J Nhan counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Raymond J. Nhan as counsel of record for Los Angeles County for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Raymond J Nhan added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Nhan, Raymond)
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zachary Crosner counsel for Plaintiff David Cortes. Blake Jones is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff David Cortes. (Crosner, Zachary)
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jamie K Serb counsel for Plaintiff David Cortes. Adding Jamie Serb as counsel of record for Plaintiff David Cortes for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff David Cortes. (Attorney Jamie K Serb added to party David Cortes(pty:pla))(Serb, Jamie)
December 14, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT RULE 26 REPORT filed by Plaintiff David Cortes (Attachments: #1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET, #2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Crosner, Zachary)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2022. (pg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(Berkowitz, Paul)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
November 3, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants County of Los Angeles, Does. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff David Cortes.[FILED IN STATE COURT 08/16/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, identifying Plaintiff David Cortes. (Berkowitz, Paul)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. (Berkowitz, Paul)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV26565 Receipt No: ACACDC-34264296 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Paul Berkowitz added to party COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES(pty:dft))(Berkowitz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Cortes v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cortes
Represented By: Zachary Crosner
Represented By: Blake Jones
Represented By: Jamie K Serb
Represented By: Michael R Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Paul Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Ganz
Represented By: Raymond J Nhan
Represented By: Ronda D Jamgotchian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?