Frank Deville v. Tristar Risk Management
Plaintiff: Frank Deville
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management
Case Number: 2:2022cv08071
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
3 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2022 Filing 30 Notice Corrected notice of hearing for motion for default judgement filed by Plaintiff corrected Notice Frank Deville. Corrected Notice docket # ( 24) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of service for amended notice of hearing for motion for default judgement)(Deville, Frank)
December 31, 2022 Filing 29 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Determination for reconsideration in appeals board in the state court Consenting Motion for Stay filed by Plaintiff seeks a consented stay in proceedings Frank Deville. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of service for stay of proceedings, #2 Proposed Order [proposed]order for for stay of proceedings) (Deville, Frank)
December 30, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tristar Risk Management (Hochhausler, John)
December 30, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Tristar Risk Management who was to respond to complaint before 11/25/2022 or request for additional time within which to respond. Tristar Risk Management #22 filed by Defendant Tristar Risk Management. (Hochhausler, John)
December 30, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Default filed by Defendant Tristar Risk Management. Motion set for hearing on 2/17/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John M Hochhausler added to party Tristar Risk Management(pty:dft)) (Hochhausler, John)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC. #22 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment currently set for January 20, 2023 to February 3, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded to refer to the list of CLOSED motion dates on Judge Statons Procedures and Schedules page prior to filing future motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
December 21, 2022 Filing 24 Notice NOTICE of Hearing for Motion for Default Judgement by Court filed by Plaintiff Frank Deville. Hearing set on 1/20/2023 at 10:30 am, Courtroom 8A before Judge Josephine L. Staton (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service for Notice of Hearing for Motion for Default Judgement)(Deville, Frank)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, (vv)
December 16, 2022 Filing 22 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Tristar Risk Management who was to respond to complaint before 11/25/2022 or request for additional time within which to respond. Tristar Risk Management filed by Plaintiff Frank Deville. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of motion for default judgement, #2 Supplement Proof of Mailing, #3 Proposed Order [proposed] Order for Default Judgement) (Deville, Frank)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment #20 , for the following reasons: (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. (2) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; (3) A proposed judgment was not submitted. (jp)
December 5, 2022 Filing 20 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 12/15/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #21 ] - First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Tristar Risk Management,(Plaintiff will Email the appropriate clerk's office the [proposed]Default Judgment ) Tristar Risk Management who was to respond to complaint before 11/25/2022 or request for additional time within which to respond. Default by Clerk entered in on 12/1/2022 against Tristar Risk Management filed by PLAINTIFF Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Supplement Proof of Service Mailing) (Deville, Frank). Modified on 12/15/2022 (jp).
December 1, 2022 Filing 19 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Tristar Risk Management. (jp)
November 30, 2022 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Tristar Risk Management Tristar Risk Management filed by PLAINTIFF, (plaintiff will email the appropriate clerk's office the proposed entry of default Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Default, #2 Exhibit Proof of service for Request for entry of default) (Deville, Frank)
November 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),,, #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Request for Clerk Entry Default must be filed as a separate document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm)
November 27, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Deville, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tristar Risk Management served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. Service of the Summons and complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers (Nicole Steuss- Customer Serv. Liaison) accept service of process on behalf of Tristar Risk Management in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Corrected Amended Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amended Declaration of Frank Deville, #2 Supplement Notice of Acknowledgement, #3 Supplement Request for Entry of Default, #4 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Default, #5 Supplement Proof of Service by mail for Notice of Acknowledgement, Amended POS, Amended Declaration, corrected amended POS for service for summons;complaint, Affidavit for request for default, Request for default)(Deville, Frank)
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Deville, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Tristar Risk Management served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11//25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon CSC-Lawyers(Nicole Steuss- Customer Serv. Liaison) accept service of process on behalf of Tristar Risk Management in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Plaintiff Amended Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Frank Deville, clarifies that the Original Summons and complaint were executed and NOT returned)(Deville, Frank)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton granting #5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (jp)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kmh)
November 7, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Frank Deville, re Complaint #1 , Summons Issued #2 , Certification and Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Sub Vol. #1 Exhibits 483 pages #4 , Civil Cover Sheet, APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case #5 , Order for electronic served on 11/7/2022. See document for further information. (jp)
November 7, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Deville, upon Defendant Tristar Risk Management served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers (Nicole Steuss - Customer Serv. Liaison) accept service of process on behalf of Tristar Risk Management in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (jp)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #6 the Case has been reassigned from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08071-JLS (AFMx). (et)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (et)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUB VOLUME NO. 1 EXHIBITS PAGE 1-483 FOR COMPLAINT as to Complaint - (Referred) #1 . filed by Plaintiff Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Exhibit, #2 Part 2 to Exhibit, #3 Part 3 to Exhibit)(et)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frank Deville. (et)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred) #1 as to Defendant Tristar Risk Management. (et)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Tristar Risk Management. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee$402 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Deville v. Tristar Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Deville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management
Represented By: John M Hochhausler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?