Fernanda Miranda v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fernanda Miranda
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Gene B Sharaga
Case Number: 2:2022cv08175
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL #28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (iv)
October 30, 2023 Filing 28 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss this case filed by plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL) (Dolin, Tionna)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S COSTS AND EXPENSES #26 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant FCA to satisfy and resolve Plaintiff's reasonable fees, costs and expenses in the amount of $8,500.00. Defendant FCA's payment is to be made to counsel for Plaintiff within 60 days of entry of this Order. (iv)
May 18, 2023 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $8,500.00, Joint STIPULATION for Order REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER filed by Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2023 Filing 25 JUDGMENT #24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment be entered as follows: 1. Plaintiff FERNANDA MIRANDA (Plaintiff) will surrender the 2019 Dodge Challenger. VIN 2C3CDZAG5KH750868 (the "Subject Vehicle") by delivering the Subject Vehicle to Defendant FCA US, LLC (FCA) on a date, time, and place mutually agreeable no later than 90 days after FCA's counsel receives all documents necessary to process the settlement and surrender, unless circumstances caused by Plaintiff result in delay. 2. Without admitting liability, FCA will pay Plaintiff the sum of $79,500.00 for the Subject Vehicle, inclusive of any and all loan payoff amounts, civil penalties, and any incidental/consequential damages, and any and all liability claimed in this action subject to proof. FCA will satisfy such funding obligations within 90 days after FCA's counsel receives all documents necessary to process the settlement and surrender, unless circumstances caused by Plaintiff result in delay. 3. If the parties are unable to resolve attorneys' fees and costs, Plaintiff may seek reasonable costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees pursuant to a properly noticed motion pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this Court, and California Civil Code section 1794(d). See Judgment for details. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
May 3, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
May 3, 2023 Filing 23 MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gene B Sharaga: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Sharaga, Gene)
May 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gene B Sharaga has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 6/12/2023. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 1/12/2024. Last Day to Hear Motions 2/12/2024. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 4/1/2024. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 4/22/2024 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 to 7 Days) set for 5/14/2024 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/23/2024. (iv)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On its own motion, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2023 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 6, 2023 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs)
December 7, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; Stellantis Ventures B.V. (formerly known as FCA Holdco B.V.); Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
December 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Fernanda Miranda for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Fernanda Miranda(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessue Gastelum, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 8, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (et)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Fernanda Miranda, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34295155 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Fernanda Miranda. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Fernanda Miranda(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernanda Miranda v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernanda Miranda
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Gene B Sharaga
Represented By: Gene B Sharaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?