Travelers Commercial Insurance Company v. Theresa Hall et al
Defendant: Theresa Hall, Charles Hall and John Hall, Jr.
Petitioner: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv08234
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Huntsman, Roy)
December 12, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #13 by Judge Percy Anderson. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (aco)
December 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
December 9, 2022 Filing 15 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for January 23, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
December 9, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer to Complaint for Breach of Contract filed by Defendants Charles Hall, Theresa Hall, John Hall, Jr..(Attorney Roy E Huntsman added to party Charles Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Roy E Huntsman added to party Theresa Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Roy E Huntsman added to party John Hall, Jr.(pty:dft))(Huntsman, Roy)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, upon Defendant Charles Hall served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Charles Hall, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dane, Andrew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, upon Defendant John Hall, Jr. served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Theresa Hall, spouse in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dane, Andrew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, upon Defendant Theresa Hall served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Theresa Hall in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dane, Andrew)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.] (es)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Charles Hall, Theresa Hall, John Hall, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Charles Hall, #2 Summons for Theresa Hall) (ghap)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, (Dane, Andrew)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Dane, Andrew)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons re Charles Hall, #2 Summons re John Hall, Jr.)(Dane, Andrew)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34310831 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Attorney Andrew C Dane added to party Travelers Commercial Insurance Company(pty:pet))(Dane, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company v. Theresa Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew C Dane
Represented By: Jeffrey Vincent Commisso
Represented By: John T Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Hall
Represented By: Rowena Javier Dizon
Represented By: Roy E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hall
Represented By: Roy E Huntsman
Represented By: Rowena Javier Dizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Rowena Javier Dizon
Represented By: Roy E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?