GS Holistic, LLC v. Acmaticsmokes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: Acmaticsmokes, LLC doing business as Smoked Out Smoke Shop, Muath Snoubar and Acmaticsmokes, LLC doing business as Smoked Out Smoke Shop and Vape
Case Number: 2:2022cv08606
Filed: November 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Muath Snoubar. (lc)
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to ACMATICSMOKES, LLC d/b/a SMOKED OUT SMOKE SHOP (lc)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Remaining Summons)(Leon, Tomas)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car)
November 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, identifying Chris Folkerts, GS Holistic, LLC, Leon Law LLP, Tomas Carlos Leon, ACMATICSMOKES, LLC d/b/a SMOKED OUT SMOKE SHOP & VAPE and MUATH SNOUBAR. (Leon, Tomas)
November 25, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
November 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
November 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34378287 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attorney Tomas Carlos Leon added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla))(Leon, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. Acmaticsmokes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Tomas Carlos Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acmaticsmokes, LLC doing business as Smoked Out Smoke Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muath Snoubar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acmaticsmokes, LLC doing business as Smoked Out Smoke Shop and Vape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?