Ecure CA, LLC v. Regal Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ecure CA, LLC
Defendant: Regal Medical Group, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv08948
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND #12 , and DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #13 , calendared for hearing on 1/30/2023, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE SUR-REPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO REMAND #20 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (lom)
January 18, 2023 Filing 20 REQUEST for Leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Remand filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Permission to File Sur-Reply Regarding Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Remand) (Torres, Paul)
January 13, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Ecure CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Chan, Eric)
January 13, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #13 filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Torres, Paul)
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #13 filed by Plaintiff Ecure CA, LLC. (Chan, Eric)
January 6, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Torres in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit A - September 9, 2022 Spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit B - October 21, 2022 Spreadsheet, #4 Exhibit C - Meet and Confer Letter to Dr. Nazarian, #5 Exhibit D - November 9, 2022 Spreadsheet, #6 Exhibit E - Mr. Chan's November 15, 2022 E-mail to Paul Torres, #7 Exhibit F - November 18, 2022 Spreadsheet, #8 Exhibit G - December 6, 2022 Spreadsheet, #9 Exhibit H - December 5, 2022 E-mail from Mr. Chan, #10 Declaration of Mary Coash in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Remand, #11 Proof of Service)(Torres, Paul)
January 4, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Avi Rutschman on behalf of Plaintiff Ecure CA, LLC (Attorney Avi Rutschman added to party Ecure CA, LLC(pty:pla))(Rutschman, Avi)
December 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Torres in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1), #2 Exhibit A: E-mail Attaching Claims Spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit B: Claims Spreadsheet, #4 Declaration of Mary Coash in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1), #5 Proof of Service, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1)) (Torres, Paul)
December 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Ecure CA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion) (Chan, Eric)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/17/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/23/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2023, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) and 28 U.S.C. 1442(a)(1) filed by Defendant Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proof of Service)(Torres, Paul)
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sh)
December 9, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/20/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 9 EXHIBIT 8 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
December 9, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Ecure CA, LLC.[FILED IN STATE COURT 05/27/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on December 9, 2022. (Torres, Paul)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., identifying Regal Medical Group, Inc.; Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc.; and Ecure CA, LLC. (Attorney Paul M. Torres added to party Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Torres, Paul)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Torres, Paul)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22SMCV00777 Receipt No: ACACDC-34455160 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Declaration of Paul Torres in Support of Defendant Regal Medical Group, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California) (Attorney Paul M. Torres added to party Regal Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Torres, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecure CA, LLC v. Regal Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecure CA, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Min Chang
Represented By: Avi Rutschman
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Torres
Represented By: Mary Tesh-Glarum
Represented By: Michael M. Amir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Torres
Represented By: Mary Tesh-Glarum
Represented By: Michael M. Amir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?