Onni South Hill LP v. Lance Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Onni South Hill LP
Defendant: Roshena Johnson, Lance Jackson and Does 1 to 10 iclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv08988
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Roshena Johnson re Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 . (gk)
January 4, 2023 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Roshena Johnson re Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) #8 . (gk)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles. (rolm)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) #3 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: As explained in the attached statement, the Request is DENIED because: The District Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction and removal jurisdiction. The action is frivolous or malicious. This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attached statement. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Roshena Johnson. (sh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Roshena Johnson, (sh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 22STUD04711 with copy of summons and complaint.[CONFORMED COPY FILED IN LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR State Court on 08/18/2022]. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar., filed by Defendant Roshena Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onni South Hill LP v. Lance Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onni South Hill LP
Represented By: Chris J Evans
Represented By: Melissa Maria Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roshena Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10 iclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?