Onni South Hill, LP v. Lance Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Onni South Hill, LP
Defendant: Lance Jackson, Anthony Lopez and Does 1 to 10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv09233
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 22STUD04711, acknowledged on 1/4/2023. (iv)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Anthony Lopez re Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form #8 (rolm)
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Anthony Lopez re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 (rolm)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 Mail Returned addressed to Anthony Lopez re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 (rolm)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 Mail Returned addressed to Anthony Lopez re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 (rolm)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles. (rolm)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin remanding case to Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, Case number 22STUD04711 *See Order for Details.* Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rolm)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Anthony Lopez. (ghap)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by defendant Anthony Lopez. (ghap)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles, case number 22STUD04711 with CONFORMED copy of complaint. No copy of summons provided. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Rozella A Oliver., filed by defendant Anthony Lopez. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onni South Hill, LP v. Lance Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onni South Hill, LP
Represented By: Chris J Evans
Represented By: Melissa Maria Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?