Ismail Mora v. John Doe et al
Plaintiff: Ismail Mora
Defendant: John Doe and Ventura County
Case Number: 2:2023cv00013
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for pretrial proceedings. Plaintiff is advised that the court presently is screening the complaint in this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Until the complaint has been screened and the court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendants (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of address Changing plaintiffs address to Corcoran State Prison BM6614, 4A-1R Cell 6, P O Box 3476 Corcoran CA 93212. Filed by Plaintiff Ismail Mora. (es)
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $8.00 initial partial filing fee from plaintiff Ismail Mora on 02/07/2023, receipt number LA249932, re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P),, #4 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dl)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: GRANTING #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 . It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $8.00 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (lc)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER filed by plaintiff Ismail Mora. (ghap)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants John Doe, Ventura County pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by plaintiff Ismail Mora. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ismail Mora v. John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismail Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?