Floyd EuGene Bender v. J. Wu et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Eugene Bender, Jr.
Defendant: J. Wu and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2023cv00212
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #5 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that Plaintiff has the opportunity to provide: the missing information identified.
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) filed by Plaintiff Floyd Eugene Bender, Jr, (es)
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Floyd Eugene Bender, Jr. (es)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order Regarding Notice of Interested Parties by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Plaintiff is ordered to comply with Local Rule 7.1-1 FORTHWITH and by no later than February 17, 2023. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order may subject Plaintiff to sanctions. [See document for further information.] (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (es)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. (jtil)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Floyd Eugene Bender, Jr. against Defendants Jane Doe, J. Wu, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd EuGene Bender v. J. Wu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Eugene Bender, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?