Mahmood Sabzi v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Mahmood Sabzi
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 2:2023cv00295
Filed: January 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Electronic Filing re Add and Terminate Judges, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #12 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Summons Issued #14 , Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application #17 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #16 , Summons Request #11 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc E. Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34659297) #15 , Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application #18 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #9 , Summons Request #2 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #10 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 , Add and Terminate Attorneys, Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 e-mailed to Alisa Adams bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-"5.1.1 The email account that you tried to reach does not exist.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Daniel M. Soar on behalf of Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael A. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc E. Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34659297) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
January 23, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc E. Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34659297) filed by Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission to Dann) (Adams, Alisa)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (rolm)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi, identifying None. (Adams, Alisa)
January 18, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi. (Adams, Alisa)
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael A Smith on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Solar on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marc Edward Dann on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The incorrect document entitled "Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons" was uploaded as docket No. 2 instead of the proposed summons form AO-440.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
January 16, 2023 Filing 2 [Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons] filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi. (Adams, Alisa) Modified on 1/17/2023 (et).
January 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34623174 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mahmood Sabzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Approval of Forbearance, #2 Exhibit 2 - Forbearance Plan, #3 Exhibit 3 - RFI Payoff and TILA, #4 Exhibit 4 - NOE Improper Fees, #5 Exhibit 5 - NOE Responses, #6 Exhibit 6 - Payoff Quote, #7 Exhibit 7 - NOE Credit Reporting Issues, #8 Exhibit 8 - NOE No Response to TILA, #9 Exhibit 9 - NOE Response, #10 Exhibit 10 - CFPB Narratives, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Alisa Rose Adams added to party Mahmood Sabzi(pty:pla))(Adams, Alisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahmood Sabzi v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmood Sabzi
Represented By: Alisa Rose Adams
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Mitchell Chyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?