Jeanmax Darbouze v. Sammy Wiess et al
Plaintiff: Jeanmax Darbouze
Defendant: Sammy Wiess and Jeff Yanuck
Case Number: 2:2023cv00966
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Cormac J. Carney: denying #8 MOTION for Reconsideration. (see document for details) (hr)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff re Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P) #7 . Jeanmax Darbouze. (mba)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (Prisoner Non-Habeas Case). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/6/2023 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC, Central District of California. CASE TRANSFERRED. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/13/2023.]
February 6, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Transfer Order served on Jeanmax Darbouze. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/13/2023.]
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/31/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 3/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Alvarez, R.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/13/2023.]
February 1, 2023 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jeanmax Darbouze. (Alvarez, R.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/13/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jeanmax Darbouze. (Alvarez, R.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/13/2023.] Modified on 2/13/2023 (car).
January 31, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sammy Wiess, Jeff Yanuck by Jeanmax Darbouze.(Alvarez, R.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/13/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeanmax Darbouze v. Sammy Wiess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanmax Darbouze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy Wiess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Yanuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?